SC S0884 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Act No. 136
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Rename Certain Precincts, And To Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office
Title
Voting precincts in Greenwood County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Act No. 136 | |
2018-03-14 | Effective date 03/12/18 | |
2018-03-12 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-03-07 | Ratified R 140 | |
2018-03-01 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable Greenwood Delegation |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Greenwood Delegation |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-18 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |