SC S0883 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Recommitted to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 55-11-440 So As To Provide The Richland-lexington Airport Commission May Make Application For The Purpose Of Establishing And Maintaining Foreign-trade Zones In Certain Counties, Select And Describe The Location Of The Zones For Which Application May Be Made, Promulgate Certain Regulations, Own, Erect, Maintain, And Operate Buildings In A Foreign-trade Zone, And Do All Things Necessary And Proper To Achieve Compliance With The Foreign-trade Zones Act.
Title
Richland-Lexington Airport Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Cromer [R] | Sen. Nikki Setzler [D] | Sen. Shane Massey [R] | Sen. Darrell Jackson [D] |
Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4702 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Act No. 128