SC S0882 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 166
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - Act No. 166
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, To Enact The "south Carolina Private Flood Insurance Act" By Adding Chapter 101 To Title 38 So As To Advance Different Flood Insurance Coverages. - Ratified Title
Title
SC Private Flood Insurance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Act No. 166 | |
2020-10-07 | Effective date 11/27/20 | |
2020-09-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 160 | |
2020-09-23 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2020-09-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0 |
2020-09-22 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-15 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-03-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-01-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4828 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry