SC S0881 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 38-9-200, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Reinsurance Credits, So As To, Among Other Things, Adopt The Reciprocal Jurisdiction Amendment From The National Association Of Insurance Commissioners (naic) Model Law And To Make Other Conforming Changes; And To Amend Section 38-9-210, As Amended, Relating To The Reduction From Liability For Reinsurance, So As To Correct A Statutory Reference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reinsurance credits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-03-11SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-03-10SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2020-03-10SenateRead second time
2020-01-31 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
2020-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time
2019-12-11SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2019-12-11SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H4829 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
389200(n/a)See Bill Text
389210(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback