SC S0877 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-12 - Veto sustained Ayes-14 Nays-27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-12 - Veto sustained Ayes-14 Nays-27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Trustees Of Hampton County School District No. 2 Of Hampton County To Issue General Obligation Bonds Of The School District Within Its Constitutional Debt Limit, In One Or More Series, To Defray The Loss Of American Reinvestment And Recovery Act Funds And Education Finance Act Funds To The School District, To Prescribe The Conditions Under Which The Bonds May Be Issued And The Purposes For Which The Proceeds May Be Expended, And To Make Provision For The Payment Of The Bonds
Title
Hampton County Board of Trustees, District 2
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-12 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto R72, S. 877 (Y: 14 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-24 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 96 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 96 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-12 | Veto sustained Ayes-14 Nays-27 | |
2011-06-07 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-06-01 | Ratified R 72 | |
2011-05-25 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Roll call Yeas-1 Nays-0 | |
2011-05-24 | Read second time | |
2011-05-19 | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-05-18 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2011-05-18 | Roll call Ayes-2 Nays-0 | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time | |
2011-05-12 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-05-11 | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
Same As/Similar To
S0974 (Similar To) 2012-01-11 - Roll call Yeas-16 Nays-28