SC S0873 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize March 19, 2018, As "women In Public Office Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Women in Public Office Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2018-01-31 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Invitations |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Polled out of committee Invitations |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Invitations |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |