SC S0872 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Act No. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Act No. 154
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Retirement Honorary Promotion Provisions To Honorably Discharged Servicemembers Who Are Removed From The National Guard Due To Medical Conditions, And To Provide That The Expanded Honorary Promotion Eligibility Described Above Is To Be Applied Retroactively
Title
Retirement of members of the S.C. National Guard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Act No. 154 | |
2012-05-17 | Effective date See Act for Effective Date | |
2012-05-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Ratified R 174 | |
2012-04-20 | Read third time and enrolled | |
2012-04-19 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day | |
2012-04-19 | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time | |
2012-03-28 | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-02-23 | Roll call Ayes-29 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-23 | Read second time | |
2012-02-22 | Committee report: Favorable General | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Committee on General | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced and read first time |