SC S0868 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 48-39-280, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The State's Beach Preservation Policy, So As To Apply Certain Exceptions To The Establishment Of A Baseline For Coastal Erosion Zones And To Remove The Study Requirement In Cases Where Primary Oceanfront Sand Dunes Do Not Exist.
Title
Beach preservation policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-02-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |