SC S0865 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 63-1-50, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Joint Citizens And Legislative Committee On Children, So As To Reauthorize The Committee Through December 31, 2030.
Title
Joint Citizens and Legislative Committee on Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-46 Nays-0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Family and Veterans' Services |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4800 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services