SC S0862 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To The Exception For Projects By A Property Owner For Personal Use, To Provide That An Owner Of Residential Property Who Improves The Property Or Who Builds Or Improves The Structures Or Appurtenances On The Property At A Cost Of More Than Two Thousand Five Hundred Dollars Shall Not Within Two Years After Completion Or Issuance Of A Certificate Offer The Structure For Sale Or Rent, And Construction Or Improvements To The Structure, Group Of Structures, Or Appurtenances That Cost The Owner-builder Less Than Two Thousand Five Hundred Dollars Are Not Evidence Of "sale" Or "rent" For The Purposes Of This Section.
Title
Residential property improvements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-1 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |