SC S0859 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-05 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 06-12-12
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-05 - Debate adjourned until Tues., 06-12-12
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establish Provisions For Residential Treatment Facilities For Children And Adolescents To Prohibit Licensure By The Department Of Health And Environmental Control Of A Facility Unless It Is At Least One Thousand Feet From A School, Childcare Facility, Park, Public Swimming Pool, And Mass Transportation Stops; That Requires A Facilty To Notify Law Enforcement Of The Admission Of A Child Who Has Charges For A Violent Crime Pending Or Who Has Been Convicted Of A Violent Crime Within The Previous Five Years, To Provide Sanctions For Facilities In Violation Of This Requirement, And To Require A Child To Register As A Sex Offender If The Provisions Of Registration Apply To That Child's Offense; That Require The Department To Develop Levels Of Facility Licensure, And Levels Of Licensure For Programs Within A Facility, Based Upon Client Disorders And Behavior And Supervision, Safety, And Security Factors Within Each Facility Or Program Level; And That Require These Facilities To Notify Law Enforcement Upon A Client Leaving The Facility Without Permission And To Maintain Records Of These Matters, Which Are Subject To Inspection By The Department.
Title
Residential treatment facilities for children and adolescents that prohibit licensure by DHEC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Debate adjourned until Tues., 06-12-12 | |
2012-05-30 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-02-23 | Roll call Ayes-31 Nays-0 | |
2012-02-23 | Read second time | |
2012-02-23 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-02-21 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs | |
2011-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs | |
2011-04-28 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4148 (Similar To) 2011-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 7 | 272 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 7 | 274 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 7 | 276 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 7 | 278 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |