SC S0857 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 40-13-20, Relating To Definitions Concerning Cosmetology And Cosmetologists So As To Provide A Definition For "mobile Salon" And "portable Cosmetologist, Esthetician, Or Nail Technician Operation"; And By Adding Section 40-13-365 So As To Provide For Permitting And Regulation Of Mobile Salons And Portable Cosmetologist, Esthetician, Or Nail Technician Operations.
Title
Mobile Cosmetology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-04-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |