SC S0849 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 44-53-230, Relating To Schedule Iii Controlled Substances, So As To Add Xylazine As A Schedule Iii Controlled Substance, With Exceptions; And By Adding Section 44-53-372 So As To Prohibit The Production, Manufacture, Distribution, Or Possession Of Xylazine, With Exceptions, And To Establish Associated Criminal Penalties.
Title
Xylazine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Rice, Senn, Adams, Tedder |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4617 (Similar To) 2024-05-29 - Act No. 177