SC S0844 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Create A Review And Study Committee, To Provide That The Review And Study Committee Shall Conduct A Thorough Study And Review Of South Carolina's Civil Justice And Insurance Laws Regarding Coverage Availability, Premium Rates, And Deductibles; And To Provide That The Review And Study Committee Shall Report Its Findings And Recommendations To The General Assembly And The Governor.
Title
Study Committee
Sponsors
Sen. Luke Rankin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Hutto, Campsen, Talley, Harpootlian, Garrett, M.Johnson |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |