SC S0843 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Immunity From Criminal Or Civil Liability For A School Employee Or Volunteer Who In Good Faith Gratuitously Intervenes On Behalf Of A Student Subjected To Harassment, Intimidation, Or Bullying.
Title
Bullying
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4564 (Similar To) 2014-01-23 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works