SC S0839 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Act No. 216
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That It Is Lawful To Grow Industrial Hemp In This State, That Industrial Hemp Is Excluded From The Definition Of Marijuana, To Prohibit The Growing Of Industrial Hemp And Marijuana On The Same Property Or Otherwise Growing Marijuana In Close Proximity To Industrial Hemp To Disguise The Marijuana Growth, To Define Certain Terms, And To Provide Penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial Hemp

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 76 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-12 Act No. 216
2014-06-11 Effective date 06/02/14
2014-06-02 Signed By Governor
2014-05-29 Ratified R 223
2014-05-20HouseRead third time and enrolled
2014-05-14HouseRoll call Yeas-72 Nays-28
2014-05-14HouseRead second time
2014-05-13HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 5-14-14
2014-04-10HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 5-6-14
2014-04-02HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2014-03-27HouseCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-18HouseIntroduced and read first time
2014-03-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2014-03-12SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2014-03-12SenateRead second time
2014-03-06SenateAmended
2014-03-05SenateAmended
2014-02-28 Scrivener's error corrected
2014-02-27SenateCommittee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources
2014-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2014-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time
2013-12-10SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2013-12-10SenatePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback