SC S0826 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Act No. 197
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide That A Single Sample May Be Used For The First And Second Tests If A Second Test Is Administered

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Worker's compensation insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-21 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-10 Act No. 197
2014-06-06 Effective date 06/02/14
2014-06-02 Signed By Governor
2014-05-29 Ratified R 221
2014-05-22HouseRead third time and enrolled
2014-05-21HouseRoll call Yeas-93 Nays-2
2014-05-21HouseRead second time
2014-05-15HouseCommittee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
2014-03-06HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2014-03-06HouseIntroduced and read first time
2014-03-05SenateRead third time and sent to House
2014-03-04SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2014-03-04SenateRead second time
2014-03-04SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2014-02-27SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
2014-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2014-01-14SenateIntroduced and read first time
2013-12-10SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2013-12-10SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3873500(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback