SC S0820 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Delete A Prior Reference To A Date And Provide A Subsequent Referendum May Not Be Held Less Than Forty-eight Months Following The Failure Of A Question

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary alcohol permits, referendum vote

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31 Act No. 193
2018-05-24 Effective date 05/17/18
2018-05-17 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 211
2018-05-10SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-1
2018-05-10SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2018-05-10HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2018-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-87 Nays-0
2018-05-09HouseRead second time
2018-05-09HouseAmended
2018-05-03HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2018-04-10HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-10HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-04-09SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-03-29SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2018-03-29SenateRead second time
2018-03-29SenateAmended
2018-03-28SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-16SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Malloy, Shealy, Rice, Timmons
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-12-06SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-12-06SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6162010(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback