SC S0815 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Require A Pharmacy Benefit Manager To Reimburse A Provider Within Seven Business Days Of Payment By A Payor.
Title
Pharmacy benefit managers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H5038 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Act No. 177
H5044 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
H5044 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 71 | 2130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 71 | 2150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |