SC S0811 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
Pending: House Invitations and Memorial Resolutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Urge The Federal Government To Work Expeditiously To Remove Barriers To Conducting Research On The Use Of Cannabis To Treat Medical Conditions And Illnesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis research

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2018-03-21HouseIntroduced
2018-03-20SenateAdopted, sent to House
2018-03-15SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-06SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2017-12-06SenatePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback