SC S0810 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Criminal Penalties For Certain Knowing And Willing Violations Concerning Pawn Tickets

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pawn transactions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31 Act No. 191
2018-05-24 Effective date See Act
2018-05-17 Signed By Governor
2018-05-14 Ratified R 209
2018-05-10SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
2018-05-10SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2018-05-10 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-05-10HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2018-05-09HouseRoll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
2018-05-09HouseRead second time
2018-05-09HouseAmended
2018-05-09HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2018-05-03HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2018-05-02HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2018-04-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-04-26HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-04-05HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-04-05HouseIntroduced and read first time
2018-04-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-29SenateRoll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
2018-03-29SenateRead third time and sent to House
2018-03-29SenateCommittee Amendment Amended and Adopted
2018-03-28SenateRead second time
2018-03-22SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-12-06SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2017-12-06SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4039145(n/a)See Bill Text
4039160(n/a)See Bill Text
4039165(n/a)See Bill Text
403940(n/a)See Bill Text
403970(n/a)See Bill Text
403990(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0810&session=122&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/810_20171206.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/810_20180322.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/810_20180329.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/810_20180403.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/810_20180426.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/810_20180427.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/810_20180509.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/810_20180510.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=14482
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15188
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=15244

Bill Comments

feedback