SC S0801 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The United States Highway 378 Bypass Over United States Highway 52 In Lake City "farrah Turner Memorial Bypass" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing The Designation.
Title
Farrah Turner Memorial Bypass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |