SC S0785 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


Revise The Membership Of The Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Consumer Affairs Commission



2018-03-14 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-02-28SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-02-20SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced and read first time
2017-12-06SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
376502(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

Bill Comments