SC S0778 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 279
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 279
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "south Carolina Statutory Health Care Power Of Attorney Act"; To Define Applicable Terms; To Outline The Part's Requirements And Applicability; To Provide Execution And Witness Requirements; And To Specify The Proper Form Of A Health Care Power Of Attorney
Title
S.C. Uniform Power of Attorney Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 20 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Act No. 279 | |
2016-06-22 | Effective date 01/01/17 | |
2016-06-09 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-06 | Ratified R 294 | |
2016-06-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-6 |
2016-06-02 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2016-06-02 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2016-06-02 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-06-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2016-06-01 | House | Read second time |
2016-06-01 | House | Amended |
2016-05-31 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Bennett, Johnson, Thurmond, Young |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4827 (Similar To) 2016-02-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary