SC S0773 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increase The Penalties For Violations Of This Provision.
Title
Failure to stop for law enforcement
Sponsors
Sen. Rex Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Withdrawn |
2018-03-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Shealy, Timmons |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3245 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works