SC S0768 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Nominate Mr. William Inman To Serve On The Savannah River Site Research Authority Board Of Directors.
Title
Inman, William to serve on Savannah River Site Research Authority Board of Directors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2021-04-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |