SC S0761 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Of South Carolina Highway 45 And Us Highway 52 In St. Stephen In Berkeley County "dr. Sam Schumann Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing The Designation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dr. Sam Schumann Intersection

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-10HouseAdopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
2023-05-09HouseCommittee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2023-05-04HouseReferred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2023-05-04HouseIntroduced
2023-05-03SenateAdopted, sent to House
2023-05-03 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-05-02SenateRecalled from Committee on Transportation
2023-05-02SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2023-05-02SenateIntroduced

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback