SC S0720 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Declare The Month Of May 2015 As "teen Pregnancy Prevention Month" Throughout The State And To Encourage All South Carolinians To Work Together To Reduce And Prevent Teen Pregnancy For The Future Success Of Our Young People.
Title
Teen Pregnancy Prevention Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
H4119 (Similar To) 2015-05-26 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence