SC S0712 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Ratify A 2001 Expansion Of The District's Service Area Pursuant To A Transfer Of Territory From The Belton-honea Path Water Authority

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadway Water and Sewer District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10 Act No. 107
2019-05-17 Effective date 05/13/19
2019-05-13 Signed By Governor
2019-05-09 Ratified R 56
2019-05-09HouseRead third time and enrolled
2019-05-08HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2019-05-08HouseRead second time
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report: Favorable Anderson Delegation
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Anderson Delegation
2019-04-11HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-04-10SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-04-03SenateRead second time
2019-03-27SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback