SC S0707 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Noon On Wednesday, May 1, 2019, As The Time And Date To Elect Three At-large Members To The Board Of Trustees Of The Wil Lou Gray Opportunity School, Whose Terms Will Expire June 30, 2023; To Elect A Member To The Board Of Visitors Of The Citadel, At-large Seat, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2025; A Member To The Board Of Trustees Of Coastal Carolina University, First Congressional District, Seat 1, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2023; Third Congressional District, Seat 3, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2023; Fifth Congressional District, Seat 5, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2023; Seventh Congressional District, Seat 7, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2023; At-large Seat 9, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2023; At-large, Seat 11, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2023; At-large Seat 13, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2023; And To Elect A Member To The Board Of Trustees Of The Medical University Of South Carolina, Fourth Congressional District, Medical Seat, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2020.
Title
Higher education board elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-03-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |