SC S0700 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Blatt Room 403
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 in Blatt Room 403
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Article 8 To Chapter 5, Title 39 To Establish The "south Carolina Earned Wage Access Services Act" So As To Provide For Requirements For Earned Wage Access Services Providers, And To Provide For Certain Exemptions And Limitations.
Title
Earned Wage Access Services Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-05-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |