SC S0694 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide For Referral To The United States Department Of Labor Allegations Made By A Private Sector Employee Of A Violation Of Section 41-15-510 And To Provide For Civil Remedies
Title
Remedies for employees charging discrimination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate: to concur in House amendments (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - House: Passage of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Act No. 50 | |
2011-06-20 | Effective date 06/14/11 | |
2011-06-14 | Signed By Governor | |
2011-06-08 | Ratified R 83 | |
2011-06-01 | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 | |
2011-06-01 | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments | |
2011-05-25 | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 | |
2011-05-25 | Read second time | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-05-11 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-05-11 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-28 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-04-28 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-04-27 | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 | |
2011-04-27 | Read second time | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry | |
2011-03-15 | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4127 (Similar To) 2011-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry