SC S0693 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-03 - Act No. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Circumstances In Which Federal Home Loan Banks May Exercise Their Rights Regarding Collateral Pledged By Its Insurer-members Involved In Delinquency Proceedings Brought Pursuant To The Act
Title
Insurers' Rehabilitation and Liquidation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Act No. 190 | |
2016-06-01 | Effective date 05/26/16 | |
2016-05-26 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-24 | Ratified R 193 | |
2016-05-18 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-05-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-109 Nays-0 |
2016-05-17 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-05 | House | Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-06-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2015-06-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-05-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H4169 (Similar To) 2015-05-13 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 27 | 475 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 27 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 27 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |