SC S0692 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Pursuant To Section 9, Article Iii, Of The Constitution Of This State, 1895, When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn On Thursday, May 11, 2017, Not Later Than 5:00 P.m., Or Anytime Earlier, Each House Shall Stand Adjourned To Meet In Statewide Session At 12:00 Noon On Tuesday, May 23, 2017, And Continue In Statewide Session, If Necessary, Until Not Later Than 5:00 P.m. On Thursday, May 25, 2017, For The Consideration Of Certain Specified Matters, And To Provide That When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn Not Later 12:00 Noon Tuesday, January 9, 2018, The General Assembly Shall Stand Adjourned Sine Die.
Title
Sine Die Adjournment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House: Adopt Concurrent Resolution (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-10-17 |
2017-05-04 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-9-17 |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |