SC S0682 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Bridge On U.s. Highway 76 Over Jefferies Creek "john 'jack' Moulton Robinson, Jr. Bridge" And To Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing The Designation.
Title
John 'Jack' Moulton Robinson, Jr. Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-05-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-05-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Introduced |