SC S0680 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Act No. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Act No. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office And To Correct Outdated References To The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office
Title
Florence County voting precincts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Act No. 128 | |
2018-02-08 | Effective date 7/1/17 | |
2018-02-05 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-02-01 | Ratified R 132 | |
2018-01-09 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |