SC S0672 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Pursuant To Section 9, Article Iii, Of The Constitution Of This State, 1895, When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn On Thursday, May 11, 2017, Not Later Than 5:00 P.m., Or Anytime Earlier, Each House Shall Stand Adjourned To Meet In Statewide Session At 12:00 Noon On Tuesday, May 23, 2017, And Continue In Statewide Session, If Necessary, Until Not Later Than 5:00 P.m. On Thursday, May 25, 2017, For The Consideration Of Certain Specified Matters, And To Provide That When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn Not Later 12:00 Noon Tuesday, January 9, 2018, The General Assembly Shall Stand Adjourned Sine Die.
Title
Sine Die Adjournment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Introduced |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0672&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/672_20170427.htm |