SC S0670 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A Senate Resolution To Recognize April 15, 2021 As "osteopathic Medicine Day" In South Carolina In Honor Of The Important Role That Doctors Of Osteopathic Medicine Play In Meeting The Healthcare Needs Of The Citizens Of South Carolina, The Military, And Our Country As A Whole.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Osteopathic Medicine Day

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateAdopted
2021-04-07SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2021-04-07SenatePolled out of committee Medical Affairs
2021-03-16SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback