SC S0668 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize Tuesday, April 2, 2019 As "children's Advocacy Center Day" In South Carolina In Order To Call Attention To The Significant Problem Of Child Abuse And Neglect.
Title
Children's Advocacy Center Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0668&session=123&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess123_2019-2020/prever/668_20190314.htm |