SC S0666 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 56-2-105 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Department Of Motor Vehicles' Issuance Of Golf Cart Permits And The Operation Of Golf Carts Along The State's Highways, To Provide That A Municipality May Adopt An Ordinance That Allows For The Operation Of Golf Carts That Are Equipped With Working Headlights And Rear Lights During Non-daylight Hours.
Title
Golf carts
Sponsors
Sen. Wes Climer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-4 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
H3945 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works