SC S0655 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Of The 12th Street Extension (sc-35) And I-77 In Cayce "noel K. Yobs Intersection" And To Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.
Title
Noel K. Yobs Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced |