SC S0654 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Motor Vehicles Name The Department Of Motor Vehicles' Field Office Located At 509 Liberty Street In Batesburg-leesville "corporal Kyle Carpenter Field Office" And To Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location That Contain The Designation.
Title
Corporal Kyle Carpenter Field Office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-03-06 | House | Introduced |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2018-03-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Transportation |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Polled out of committee Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced |