SC S0637 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Add Anderson Mill Baptist, D. R. Hill Middle School, Hope, Lyman Elementary, And Trinity Presbyterian Precincts; To Remove The Friendship Baptist Precinct; And To Redesignate The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office
Title
Spartanburg County voting precincts
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Talley [R] | Sen. Shane Martin [R] | Sen. Harvey Peeler [R] | Sen. Glenn Reese [D] |
Sen. Thomas Corbin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 58 | |
2017-05-25 | Effective date 7/1/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 91 | |
2017-05-10 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-89 Nays-0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-04 | House | Recalled from Committee on Spartanburg Delegation |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Spartanburg Delegation |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |