SC S0626 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Returned to House with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-02 - Returned to House with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempt Eighty Percent Of The Fair Market Value Of A Renewable Energy Resource For A Period Of Ten Years Provided The Property Is Operational By December 31, 2020, And To Exempt A Distributed Renewable Energy Generation Property For Residential Use.
Title
Property tax exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 54 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House: Table The Motion To Commit The Bill To Lci (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House: Table The Motion To Commit The Bill To Lci (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2016-06-02 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2016-06-01 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2016-06-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-31 | House | Roll call Yeas-54 Nays-36 |
2016-05-31 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-31 | House | Amended |
2016-05-31 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2016-05-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-31-16 |
2016-05-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-05-19 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means |
2016-05-03 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-05-03 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |