SC S0602 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act No. 121
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act No. 121
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The State Board Of Education, Relating To Credential Classification, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4699, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code
Title
Credential Classification (D. No. 4699)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Act No. 121 | |
2017-05-25 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 88 | |
2017-05-09 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2017-04-19 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |