SC S0596 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Sheheen, Massey, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Sheheen, Massey, Young
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Remove The Current Members Of The Board Of Trustees Of John De La Howe School And Devolve The Board's Powers Upon An Interim Board Of Trustees Who Shall Serve Until June 30, 2019 Or Until A Full New Board Of Trustees Is Appointed And Qualified; To Provide That The Interim Board Of Trustees Is Responsible For The Selection, Periodic Evaluation, Retention, And Termination Of The School's President; To Provide For Other Specific Duties Of The Interim Board Of Trustees; And To Direct The Interim Board Of Trustees, In Consultation With The President Of The School, To Review Educational Accreditation And The Past And Current Financial Situation Of The School And Make Recommendations To Direct The School Out Of The Current Financial Crisis, With An Emphasis On Determining The Most Feasible Path The State Must Pursue To Be In Compliance With The Last Will And Testament Of John De La Howe.
Title
John De La Howe School Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 6 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Sheheen, Massey, Young |
2018-05-10 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-97 |
2018-05-10 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2018-05-10 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-5 |
2018-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-09 | House | Amended |
2018-05-03 | House | Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-04-18 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-04-06 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Polled out of committee Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |