SC S0587 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Act No. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Section 11-41-75, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To Economic Development Bonds For Conventions And Trade Shows, So As To Provide That The Provisions Requiring The Reimbursement Of Bond Proceeds, Plus Interest, Upon The Sale Of A Meeting And Exhibit Space Are Not Applicable If The Sale Proceeds Are Used In Their Entirety For A New Meeting And Exhibit Space Of Not Less Than Fifty Thousand Square Feet, Or To Reimburse A State Agency, Instrumentality, Or Political Subdivision For The Acquisition Or Construction Of A New Meeting And Exhibit Space Of Not Less Than Fifty Thousand Square Feet If Construction Occurred Prior To The Sale Of The Original Meeting And Exhibit Space, And To Provide Conditions Under Which The Exemption Applies. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic bond for conventions and trade shows

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Act No. 58
2021-06-01 Effective date 05/17/21
2021-05-17 Signed By Governor
2021-05-13 Ratified R 72
2021-05-12HouseRead third time and enrolled
2021-05-11HouseRoll call Yeas-107 Nays-3
2021-05-11HouseRead second time
2021-05-11HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2021-05-06HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 5-11-21
2021-05-04HouseCommittee report: Favorable Ways and Means
2021-04-13HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-04-08SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-04-07SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
2021-04-07SenateRead second time
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report: Favorable Finance
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
114175(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback