SC S0580 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Define Necessary Terms, To Provide The Purpose Of The Chapter, To Alter The Application Of The Chapter, To Establish Certain Powers And Duties For The Association In Relation To Impaired Or Insolvent Member Insurers, To Provide That The Board Of Directors Of The Association May Call An Assessment Of The Members And To Provide Classes For The Assessments, To Require The Association To Establish A Plan Of Operation And Require The Plan To Create Procedures For Removing A Member Of The Board Under Certain Circumstances And To Address Conflicts Of Interest, To Proscribe Certain Duties For The Director Of The Department Of Insurance To Aid In The Detection And Prevention Of Insurer Impairments And Insolvencies, To Provide That No Person May Use The Existence Of The South Carolina Life And Accident And Health Insurance Guaranty Association For The Purpose Of Insurance Sales, And To Require The Association To Prepare A Document Describing The General Purposes And Limitations Of This Chapter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Life and Accident and Health Insurance Guaranty Association

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced and read first time
2019-03-27SenateRead third time and sent to House
2019-03-26SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2019-03-26SenateRead second time
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-19SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback