SC S0568 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act No. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act No. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Board Shall Include Two Members From The County At-large, To Provide For The Manner Of Initial Appointment Of The Two At-large Members, To Provide For Staggered Terms Of The Two At-large Members, And To Conform The Addition Of Two At-large Members To The Election Of Members To The Board And Filling Vacancies On The Board
Title
Williamsburg County School District Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Sabb [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: Overide Veto By The Governor (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 41 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | Act No. 107 | |
2017-05-08 | Effective date 5/3/17 | |
2017-05-03 | House | Veto overridden Yeas-71 Nays-2 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Veto overridden by originating body Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2017-04-25 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-04-19 | Ratified R 19 | |
2017-04-05 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2017-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-78 Nays-0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable Williamsburg Delegation |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Williamsburg Delegation |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |