SC S0567 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Necessary Definitions
Title
SC Amusement Rides Safety Code
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 188 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date 05/15/18 | |
2018-05-15 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 205 | |
2018-05-04 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2018-05-03 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-0 |
2018-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-02 | House | Recalled from Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-04-05 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2018-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-03-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |